Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico di Guido

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1777³BornVico Equense
17 Dec 180326.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 183355.7SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
29 Jul 183356.0ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
16 Dec 184871.4DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico di Guido:
Bishop Giovanni Domenico di Guido (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 45.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013