Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Iovinelli, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1778BornPomigliano d'Atella
1803²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 183354.2SelectedBishop of Bovino, Italy
29 Jul 183354.5ConfirmedBishop of Bovino, Italy
4 Aug 183354.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
8 Nov 183657.8DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Iovinelli
Bishop Francesco Iovinelli C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016