Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Friedrich von Groß zu Trockau

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1758BornWürzburg
17 Apr 181355.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
6 Sep 181860.5SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
2 Oct 181860.6ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
18 Nov 182163.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
23 Dec 182163.8InstalledBishop of Würzburg, Germany
21 Mar 184082.0DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adam Friedrich von Groß zu Trockau:
Bishop Adam Friedrich von Groß zu Trockau (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013