Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Menditto

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1757Born
21 Sep 178224.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 182870.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
23 Jun 182870.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
14 Sep 182870.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Menditto
Bishop Giuseppe Menditto (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasanova

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,089
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast