Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Robert Jenky, C.S.C.

Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1947 Born
16 Jul 196720.3First VowsMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
6 Apr 197427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 Oct 199750.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
21 Oct 199750.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amantia
16 Dec 199750.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amantia
12 Feb 200254.9AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
10 Apr 200255.1InstalledBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Robert Jenky
Bishop Daniel Robert Jenky C.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Peoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Peoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,179
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast