Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas Lukumwena Lumbala, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Kole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1949 BornTshikapa
31 Mar 197929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Feb 199848.5AppointedBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jun 199848.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Oct 200859.2ResignedBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Stanislas Lukumwena Lumbala:
Bishop Stanislas Lukumwena Lumbala O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015