Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophile Kaboy Ruboneka

Bishop of Goma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1941 BornBobandana
27 Aug 197231.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Nov 199554.6AppointedBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Mar 199655.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kasongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Apr 200968.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Mar 201069.0SucceededBishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Théophile Kaboy Ruboneka:
Bishop Théophile Kaboy Ruboneka (born ) Bishop of Goma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,834
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015