Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony Toal

Bishop of Motherwell, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1956 BornRoy Bridge
10 Jul 198023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Oct 200852.0AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Dec 200852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
30 May 201356.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
29 Apr 201457.5AppointedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
23 Jun 201457.7InstalledBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony Toal:
Bishop Joseph Anthony Toal (born ) Bishop of Motherwell

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Motherwell.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,995
  • ab: CB, 31 May 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jun 2014