Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mokobe Ndjoku

Bishop of Basankusu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1949 BornDjombo
20 Aug 197829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Dec 199344.3AppointedBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Mar 199444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Nov 200152.2AppointedBishop of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mokobe Ndjoku:
Bishop Joseph Mokobe Ndjoku (born ) Bishop of Basankusu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Basankusu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,475

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013