Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Sáinz Hinojosa, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

Titular Archbishop of Iunca in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1936 BornTiquipaya
26 Aug 196226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 May 198245.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
8 May 198245.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
31 Jul 198246.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
24 Feb 198750.6AppointedArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
31 Jul 199660.1ResignedArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
12 Sep 200165.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Cochabamba, Bolivia
12 Sep 200165.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iunca in Mauretania
29 Aug 201276.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Luis Sáinz Hinojosa:
Archbishop Luis Sáinz Hinojosa O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cochabamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015