Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Enrique Curiel Herrera, Sch. P.

Bishop of Carora, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1960 Born
2 Aug 199333.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
27 Dec 199737.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
27 Dec 201858.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
27 Dec 201858.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carinola
19 Mar 201958.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carinola
30 Mar 202160.7AppointedBishop of Carora, Venezuela
22 May 202160.8InstalledBishop of Carora, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Carlos Enrique Curiel Herrera
Bishop Carlos Enrique Curiel Herrera Sch. P. (born ) Bishop of Carora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarora, Estado Lara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cochabamba, Archdiocese of Cochabamba, Bolivia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 28 Dec 2018
  • c2: CB, 4 Mar 2019
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,115
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2021
  • i: CB, 14 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Apr 2021

Quantcast