Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maixent Coly

Deceased

Bishop of Ziguinchor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1949BornAffiniam
30 Dec 198031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ziguinchor, Senegal
5 Apr 199343.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
11 Dec 199344.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
23 Oct 199546.1SucceededBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
24 Aug 201060.9DiedBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Maixent Coly:
Bishop Maixent Coly (born , died ) Bishop of Ziguinchor

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,182
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015