Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Antônio Saburido, O.S.B.

Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1947 Born
21 Mar 197830.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Dec 198336.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
31 May 200052.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
31 May 200052.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
20 Aug 200053.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
18 May 200557.9AppointedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
1 Jul 200962.0AppointedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
16 Aug 200962.1InstalledArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Antônio Saburido
Archbishop Fernando Antônio Saburido O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop of Olinda e Recife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabo de Santo Agostinho

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017