Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Sales Alencar Batista, O. Carm.

Bishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1968 Born
24 Jan 198819.7ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
29 Nov 199527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Jun 201648.1AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
14 Aug 201648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
4 Sep 201648.3InstalledBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Sales Alencar Batista
Bishop Francisco de Sales Alencar Batista O. Carm. (born ) Bishop of Cajazeiras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraripina
Ordained Bishopdevant l’église Nossa Senhora da Conceição, Araripina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cajazeiras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2016
  • i/c4: CB, 17 Jun 2016
  • c4: CB, 21 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018