Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto Breis Pereira, O.F.M.

Bishop of Juazeiro, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1965 BornSão Francisco do Sul
10 Jan 198721.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Aug 199428.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Feb 201650.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
7 May 201650.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil
7 Sep 201650.9SucceededBishop of Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Breis Pereira
Bishop Carlos Alberto Breis Pereira O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Juazeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Juazeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 14 Mar 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,907
  • s: Bollettino, 7 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Sep 2016