Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Vital Félix da Silva, S.C.I.

Bishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1965 Born
25 Feb 198620.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
12 Aug 199025.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
2 Jan 199125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
10 May 201751.9AppointedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
8 Jul 201752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
29 Jul 201752.1InstalledBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for André Vital Félix da Silva
Bishop André Vital Félix da Silva S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Limoeiro do Norte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecife, Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora de Fátima, Church, Recife, Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limoeiro do Norte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 May 2017
  • c2+/i: CB, 20 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018