Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Limacêdo Antônio da Silva

Auxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Saldae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1960 Born
12 Jan 198625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
4 Apr 201857.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
4 Apr 201857.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
10 Jun 201857.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saldae

MicroData Summary for Limacêdo Antônio da Silva
Bishop Limacêdo Antônio da Silva (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazaré da Mata, Diocese of Nazaré, Pernambuco
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Nazaré da Mata, Diocese of Nazaré, Pernambuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast