Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcelo Pinto Carvalheira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1928Born
28 Feb 195324.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 197547.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraíba, Brazil
29 Oct 197547.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitylius
27 Dec 197547.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitylius
9 Nov 198153.5AppointedBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
29 Nov 199567.5AppointedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
5 May 200476.0RetiredArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
25 Mar 201788.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Pinto Carvalheira (VIAF: 2185386)
Archbishop Marcelo Pinto Carvalheira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecife, Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco
Death PlaceRecife, Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 25 Mar 2017
  • ln: CB, 21 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017