Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura Blanco y Elguero (Helguero)

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1696Born
26 Sep 175357.1AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
20 Oct 175458.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
4 Nov 175458.3InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
12 May 176467.8DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Blanco y Elguero (Helguero)
Bishop Buenaventura Blanco y Elguero (Helguero) (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopSan José, Tacubaya

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,253
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86
  • b/c34: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 72, Number 350
  • b/c34: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 52
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast