Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Hong Yong-ho

Deceased

Bishop of P’yŏng-yang, Korea (North)

Note/Previous Titular See: (death acknowledged June 2013 - year unknown)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1906Born
25 May 193326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Peng-yang, Korea (North)
24 Mar 194437.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pyong-Yang, Korea (North)
24 Mar 194437.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
29 Jun 194437.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
10 Mar 196255.4AppointedBishop of P’yŏng-yang, Korea (North)

MicroData Summary for Francis Hong Yong-ho
Bishop Francis Hong Yong-ho (born ) Bishop of P’yŏng-yang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeijo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 29
  • d: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2013, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast