Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ireneus Hayasaka Kyubei

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Taiku, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Sufes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1888Born
29 May 191526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hakodate, Japan
10 Nov 194253.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Taiku, Korea (South)
10 Nov 194253.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
25 Dec 194254.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes
6 Jan 194657.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Taiku, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Ireneus Hayasaka Kyubei
Bishop Ireneus Hayasaka Kyubei (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Taiku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSendai
Ordained PriestSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopTae Gu

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 67
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 333
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast