Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]

Archidioecesis Ciamsciavensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 22,820 (8,814 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Changsha, Hunan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Houkouang
1838ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Houkouang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Hunan {Hu-Nan}
8 April 1856Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Houkouang Vicariate Apostolic of Hunan {Hu-Nan}
19 September 1879Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Hunan {Hu-Nan} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}
19 September 1879Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Hunan {Hu-Nan} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha]
3 December 1924ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Hunan {Hu-Nan Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha] (erected)
Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha] Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]
19509,0385,000,000.2%627332733611ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Apr 2013