Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Giacomo Novella, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Houkouang, China

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1805Born
1822¹16.8ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
22 Dec 182722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
27 Mar 184641.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
27 Mar 184641.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
23 May 184742.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
3 Nov 185146.7ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
26 Feb 187267.0DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Houkouang, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giacomo Novella (VIAF: 89229070)
Bishop Giuseppe Giacomo Novella O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Houkouang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpasio, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopU-Ichang-fu
Death PlaceLimies, Diocese of Nice, France

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 443
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,847, Number 18
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast