Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Landrieux

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1857Born
19 May 188325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Reims, France
6 Dec 191558.1AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
2 Feb 191658.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
11 Dec 192669.1DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice Landrieux
Bishop Maurice Landrieux (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrigny

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast