Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Francisco Reilly, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1908Born
2 Aug 192819.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Sep 193122.7Final VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Jun 193324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Jul 195647.5AppointedPrelate of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic
22 Jul 195647.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
30 Nov 195647.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
21 Nov 196960.9AppointedBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic
20 Jul 197768.5ResignedBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic
21 Jul 199283.5DiedBishop Emeritus of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Tomás Francisco Reilly (VIAF: 26689321)
Bishop Tomás Francisco Reilly C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de la Maguana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
Ordained PriestMt. St. Alphonsus, Seminary, Esopus, NY
Death PlaceSaratoga Springs, NY

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 107
  • fina/c1/loc: CB, 29 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Jan 2019

Quantcast