Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Tibertus McCarty, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rapid City, South Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1889BornCrossingville, PA
2 Aug 191020.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Jun 191525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jan 194353.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Military, USA
2 Jan 194353.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Anaea
25 Jan 194353.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anaea
10 Apr 194757.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
11 Mar 194858.5SucceededBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
11 Sep 196980.0RetiredBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
11 Sep 196980.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
13 Jan 197181.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
14 Sep 197283.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for William Tibertus McCarty:
Bishop William Tibertus McCarty C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rapid City

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015