Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Siino

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1904BornCapaci, Italy
5 Apr 193025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Monreale, Italy
27 Oct 195349.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
27 Oct 195349.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
29 Nov 195349.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
14 Mar 195954.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
8 Oct 196359.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Siino:
Archbishop Salvatore Siino (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Philippines

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013