Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michael George McGovern

Bishop-Elect of Belleville, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1964 Born
21 May 199429.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Apr 202055.7AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
22 Jul 202056.0Ordained BishopBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael George McGovern
Father Michael George McGovern (born ) Bishop-Elect of Belleville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained PriestHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Belleville, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Belleville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2020
  • c1: CB, 3 Apr 2020
  • mn: CB, 23 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Jun 2020

Quantcast