Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Victor Rakotondrajao

Deceased

Bishop of Mahajanga, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1960Born
29 Jul 199030.3Ordained PriestPriest of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
18 Apr 200848.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mahajanga, Madagascar
6 Jul 200848.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Mahajanga, Madagascar
2 Feb 201049.8SucceededBishop of Mahajanga, Madagascar
3 Nov 201858.6DiedBishop of Mahajanga, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Roger Victor Rakotondrajao
Bishop Roger Victor Rakotondrajao (born , died ) Bishop of Mahajanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBefelatanana
Ordained BishopCentre Don Bosco Antanimasaja, Mahajanga, Diocese of Mahajanga
Death PlaceAntananarivo

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,781
  • s: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2010
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 4 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast