Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Miarinarivo

Dioecesis Miarinarivensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antananarivo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 18,000 (6,952 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Miarinarivo-Itasy 117, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (48)834.86

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Miarinarivo
13 December 1933ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Miarinarivo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Miarinarivo
25 May 1939ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Miarinarivo Vicariate Apostolic of Miarinarivo
13 January 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Miarinarivo Prefecture Apostolic of Tsiroanomandidy (erected)
Diocese of Miarinarivo
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Miarinarivo Diocese of Miarinarivo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Miarinarivo
194934,01969,43749.0%122142,429782ap1951
Diocese of Miarinarivo
196960,315164,37336.7%211222,74115331ap1971
197880,164198,86640.3%123155,3444171ap1981
1990109,316188,00058.1%136195,7538642ap1991
1999189,182387,21748.9%227296,523144614ap2000
2000195,636418,34246.8%2610365,434175914ap2001
2001187,735374,64850.1%247316,055103517ap2002
2002184,381381,00048.4%267335,58794217ap2003
2003204,087373,46354.6%288365,66996016ap2004
2004192,035396,77448.4%297365,33476016ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Sep 2012