Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mahajanga

Dioecesis Mahagianganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 October 1989
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antsiranana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 71,900 (27,771 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Rue du Rova, B.P. 126, Mahajanga 401, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)62.22.602
  • Fax: 62.23.103

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
15 March 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga (erected)
8 January 1938Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava (erected)
Diocese of Majunga
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Majunga Diocese of Majunga
Diocese of Mahajanga
28 October 1989Name ChangedDiocese of Majunga Diocese of Mahajanga
18 October 1993Territory LostDiocese of Mahajanga Diocese of Port-Bergé (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
194939,000368,90010.6%4404488635ap1951
Diocese of Majunga
197043,337548,6077.9%41411,0577697ap1971
198052,037689,0007.6%735421,2384375ap1981
Diocese of Mahajanga
199066,560912,4797.3%1522371,7982911517ap1991
199970,040768,7069.1%2217391,7952513019ap2000
200078,451777,12410.1%2515401,9612413519ap2001
200180,175780,84210.3%2413372,1662114419ap2002
200282,592782,18010.6%3214461,7952116120ap2003
200394,074902,43210.4%3215472,0012216113ap2004
2004142,447992,79414.3%3015453,1652316113ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 27 Nov 2013