Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomáš Holub

Bishop of Plzeň, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1967 Born
28 Aug 199326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
12 Feb 201648.4AppointedBishop of Plzeň, Czech Republic
30 Apr 201648.7Ordained BishopBishop of Plzeň, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Tomáš Holub
Bishop Tomáš Holub (born ) Bishop of Plzeň

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaromer

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Plzeň.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 25 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast