Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Poola

Archbishop of Hyderabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1961 Born
20 Feb 199230.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cuddapah, India
8 Feb 200846.2AppointedBishop of Kurnool, India
19 Apr 200846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kurnool, India
19 Nov 202059.0AppointedArchbishop of Hyderabad, India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Poola
Archbishop Anthony Poola (born ) Archbishop of Hyderabad

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoluru
Ordained BishopGrounds of, JMJ College, Kurnool, Diocese of Kurnool

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hyderabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,730
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 19 Nov 2020

Quantcast