Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Aruliah Somavarapa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuddapah, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1930Born
23 Apr 195928.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 197645.9AppointedBishop of Cuddapah, India
20 Apr 197746.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cuddapah, India
24 Jan 199867.1ResignedBishop of Cuddapah, India
31 Jul 200372.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuddapah, India

MicroData Summary for Abraham Aruliah Somavarapa
Bishop Abraham Aruliah Somavarapa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuddapah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolasur

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast