Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Polti Santillán

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1938 BornSantiago del Estero
11 Aug 196324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
13 Jul 199455.7AppointedBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
22 Aug 199455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
11 Sep 199455.8InstalledBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
17 May 200667.5AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
22 Jul 200667.7InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
23 Dec 201375.1RetiredBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Francisco Polti Santillán:
Bishop Francisco Polti Santillán (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santiago del Estero.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 May 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,529
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013