Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edgardo Gabriel Storni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1936Born
23 Dec 196125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Fe, Argentina
4 Jan 197740.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
4 Jan 197740.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
25 Mar 197740.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
28 Aug 198448.3AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
30 Sep 198448.4InstalledArchbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
1 Oct 200266.4ResignedArchbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina
20 Feb 201275.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Edgardo Gabriel Storni
Archbishop Edgardo Gabriel Storni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Fe

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast