Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortunato Antonio Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1919BornGualeguaychú
20 Dec 194223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paraná, Argentina
24 Jul 196142.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
24 Jul 196142.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dices
22 Oct 196142.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dices
12 Aug 196344.6AppointedBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
7 Mar 196445.2InstalledBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
11 Nov 197758.8AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
2 Jan 197859.0InstalledBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
26 Nov 198364.9AppointedArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
17 Mar 198465.2InstalledArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
7 Apr 199475.2RetiredArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
21 Aug 199980.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Corrientes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Antonio Rossi:
Archbishop Fortunato Antonio Rossi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013