Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo Salvador Castagna

Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1931 BornBuenos Aires
4 Dec 195524.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 197847.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
24 Nov 197847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
29 Dec 197848.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
28 Aug 198453.6AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
20 Oct 198453.8InstalledBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
22 Jun 199463.4AppointedArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
27 Aug 199463.6InstalledArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
27 Sep 200776.7RetiredArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Domingo Salvador Castagna:
Archbishop Domingo Salvador Castagna (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Corrientes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013