Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Rogelio Delgado Evers

Archbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1942 Born
23 Jun 197028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
20 Mar 198643.7AppointedBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
25 Apr 198643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
11 May 198643.8InstalledBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
25 Feb 199451.6AppointedBishop of Posadas, Argentina
1 May 199451.8InstalledBishop of Posadas, Argentina
29 Mar 200057.7AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
24 May 200057.9InstalledArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
17 Jun 201774.9RetiredArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Rogelio Delgado Evers
Archbishop Alfonso Rogelio Delgado Evers (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Juan de Cuyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017