Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Esteban Cremata

Deceased

Bishop of Santo Tomé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1923BornLanús
20 Dec 194724.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 197956.0AppointedBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
6 Oct 197956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
2 Mar 198561.6DiedBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Esteban Cremata:
Bishop Carlos Esteban Cremata (born , died ) Bishop of Santo Tomé

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013