Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Argimiro Daniel Moure Piñeiro, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1921BornMar del Plata
18 Sep 194827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Apr 197554.1AppointedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
7 Jun 197554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
5 Jul 197554.3InstalledBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
8 Sep 199271.5DiedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Argimiro Daniel Moure Piñeiro:
Bishop Argimiro Daniel Moure Piñeiro S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013