Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Rodolfo Laise, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Luis, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1926Born
13 Mar 194923.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Sep 194923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Apr 197145.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Luis, Argentina
5 Apr 197145.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
29 May 197145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium
6 Jul 197145.3SucceededBishop of San Luis, Argentina
6 Jun 200175.2RetiredBishop of San Luis, Argentina
22 Jul 201993.4DiedBishop Emeritus of San Luis, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Rodolfo Laise (VIAF: 45634642)
Bishop Juan Rodolfo Laise O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Luis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires
Ordained PriestColegio Euskal Echea, Chapel, Llavallot
Ordained BishopColegio Euskal Echea, Chapel, Llavallot
Death PlaceCapuchin, Convent, San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d/sole/loc: CB, 22 Jul 2019
  • loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 960

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022