Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Maria Pires

Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1919 Born
20 Dec 194122.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 195738.1AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Sep 195738.5Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Dec 196546.7AppointedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
29 Nov 199576.7RetiredArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Maria Pires
Archbishop José Maria Pires (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórregos

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Paraíba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017