Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)

Dioecesis Arassuahyensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marcello Romano, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 25 August 1913
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Diamantina
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 23,526 (9,086 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Goias 339, 39600-000 Aracuai, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (033)3731-3159
  • Fax: 3731-1498

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
25 August 1913ErectedDiocese of Diamantina Diocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí) (erected)
1 February 1956Territory LostDiocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)
Diocese of Caratinga
Archdiocese of Diamantina
Diocese of Governador Valadares (erected)
27 November 1960Territory LostDiocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí) Diocese of Teófilo Otoni (erected)
28 March 1981Territory LostDiocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)
Diocese of Teófilo Otoni
Diocese of Almenara (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950780,000800,00097.5%19345314,716346029ap1951
19591,000,0001,030,00097.1%21426315,873568536ap1960
1965547,500550,00099.5%1682422,81242123ap1967
1970610,000670,00091.0%27113816,052113326ap1971
1976490,000550,00089.1%15112618,846152726ap1977
1980540,605603,81089.5%18133117,438184435ap1981
1990375,000416,00090.1%1562117,85773321ap1991
1999457,000483,00094.6%2463015,23362921ap2000
2000462,000489,00094.5%1872518,48073222ap2001
2001375,000400,00093.8%1772415,62582523ap2002
2002380,000495,00076.8%1782515,200102924ap2003
2003251,121383,84065.4%2611376,787142724ap2004
2004252,221383,84165.7%1782510,088112224ap2005
2006256,850390,00065.9%2052510,27481824ap2007
2012280,000420,00066.7%257328,75082025ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013