Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Tiago Broers, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caravelas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1916BornOosterblokker, Netherlands
4 Apr 194326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 May 196346.8AppointedBishop of Caravelas, Brazil
25 Jul 196347.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caravelas, Brazil
18 Apr 198366.8RetiredBishop of Caravelas, Brazil
26 Mar 199073.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Caravelas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Filippo Tiago Broers:
Bishop Filippo Tiago Broers O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caravelas

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013