Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José André Coimbra

Deceased

Bishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1900BornCarbonita Barreiras de Itamarandiba
13 Jul 192423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Feb 193837.3AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
24 Jul 193837.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
8 Jun 195554.6AppointedBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 Oct 195555.0InstalledBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Aug 196867.8DiedBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José André Coimbra:
Bishop José André Coimbra (born , died ) Bishop of Patos de Minas

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013