Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Pezzullo

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1890Born
3 Aug 191322.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 193746.1AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
11 Apr 193746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
10 Sep 197988.7DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Pezzullo
Bishop Federico Pezzullo (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrattamaggiore

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast