Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo De Chiara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1903BornStigliano
3 Aug 193027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tricarico, Italy
30 Apr 195350.1AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
12 Jul 195350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
11 Jul 197370.3AppointedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
5 Mar 197975.9RetiredBishop of Mileto, Italy
5 Mar 197975.9RetiredBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
30 Nov 198481.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo De Chiara:
Bishop Vincenzo De Chiara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mileto

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013