Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Calabria

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1906Born
16 Mar 192922.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 195043.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Otranto, Italy
6 May 195043.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Soteropolis
29 Jun 195043.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Soteropolis
10 Jul 195245.5SucceededArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
12 Jul 196053.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Benevento, Italy
12 Jul 196053.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
1 Jan 196255.0SucceededArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
24 May 198275.4DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Calabria
Archbishop Raffaele Calabria (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucera

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast