Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Pérez Arellano

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Casius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1693³BornSesma
23 Feb 173945.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
23 Feb 173945.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
10 May 173945.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
16 Mar 175662.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Pérez Arellano:
Bishop Juan Antonio Pérez Arellano (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 58, Number 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015